NY A00092 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a bank or financial institution selling or transferring a mortgage during a modification process to provide the borrower with a written list of all documents relating to such application for modification that were provided to the bank or financial institution to which such mortgage was sold or transferred; and relates to the obligations of subsequent mortgage servicer shall assume all duties and obligations related to any previously approved first lien loan modification or other foreclosure prevention alternative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a bank or financial institution selling or transferring a mortgage during a modification process to provide the borrower with a written list of all documents relating to such application for modification that were provided to the bank or financial institution to which such mortgage was sold or transferred; and relates to the obligations of subsequent mortgage servicer shall assume all duties and obligations related to any previously approved first lien loan modification or other foreclosure prevention alternative.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1819
2019-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5017A
2019-05-29SenateREFERRED TO BANKS
2019-05-29Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-29Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.365
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-05-07Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-04-16Assemblyprint number 92a
2019-04-16Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to banks
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to banks

Same As/Similar To

S05017 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A92A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00092&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00092&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00092
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00092&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00092A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00092&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00092&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00092&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A92#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback