NY A00112 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Passed on October 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-24 - signed chap.409
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Passed on October 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-24 - signed chap.409
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to indicating the placement of ballot proposals.
Title
Relates to indicating the placement of ballot proposals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | Senate | signed chap.409 |
2019-10-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.164 |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3145A |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-03-28 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-25 | Senate | amended on third reading 112a |
2019-03-25 | Senate | restored to third reading |
2019-03-25 | Senate | substitution reconsidered |
2019-03-18 | Senate | substituted by s3145 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.123 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to election law |
2019-04-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A112A |
2019-03-27 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3145A |
2019-03-27 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | recommitted to election law |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | substitution reconsidered |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.123 |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | substituted for a112 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2019-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.164 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-10-24 | Senate | signed chap.409 |
2019-10-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-04-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.164 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3145A |
2019-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | amended on third reading 112a |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | restored to third reading |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | substitution reconsidered |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | substituted by s3145 |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.123 |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S02428 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S03145 (Same As) 2019-10-24 - signed chap.409
S03145 (Same As) 2019-10-24 - signed chap.409