NY A00123 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - substituted by s2685
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Grants the Bedford central school district the authority to establish insurance reserve funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants the Bedford central school district the authority to establish insurance reserve funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29Assemblysubstituted by s2685
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.367
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-05-01Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S02685 (Same As) 2019-05-29 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback