NY A00129 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.608
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.608
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the county of Ulster within the definition of a designated community.
Title
Includes the county of Ulster within the definition of a designated community.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Cahill [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.608 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.33 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.439 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a129 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1228 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6235 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.439 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.439 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06235 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.608