NY A00157 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the category of "qualified group practice" for medical, dental and podiatric practices that comply with certain standards and authorizes such practices to operate a malpractice prevention program.
Title
Establishes the category of "qualified group practice" for medical, dental and podiatric practices that comply with certain standards and authorizes such practices to operate a malpractice prevention program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | reference changed to health |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01589 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH