NY A00163 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on October 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-24 - signed chap.410
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on October 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-24 - signed chap.410
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state board of elections to create a system to allow a copy of the candidate and contest information contained on each ballot style submitted by each county board of elections to be accessible to the public via web.
Title
Requires the state board of elections to create a system to allow a copy of the candidate and contest information contained on each ballot style submitted by each county board of elections to be accessible to the public via web.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | Senate | signed chap.410 |
2019-10-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1125 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1590 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.213 |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01590 (Same As) 2019-10-24 - signed chap.410