NY A00164 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - substituted by s2387b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to menstrual product labeling; requires label affixed thereto or a package insert, upon which there shall be plainly and conspicuously printed a list of all ingredients which shall be listed in order of predominance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to menstrual product labeling; requires label affixed thereto or a package insert, upon which there shall be plainly and conspicuously printed a list of all ingredients which shall be listed in order of predominance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted by s2387b
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.313
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.313
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-13Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 164b
2019-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-05Assemblyprint number 164a
2019-06-05Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-05-14Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S02387 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00164&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00164&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00164
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00164&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00164A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00164&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00164B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00164&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00164&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00164&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback