NY A00187 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the fines imposed on a corporation for an offense defined within the penal law.
Title
Increases the fines imposed on a corporation for an offense defined within the penal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.7 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.368 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03165 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES