NY A00187 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - approval memo.106
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - approval memo.106
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the synchronization of multiple prescriptions for recipients of medical assistance.
Title
Provides for the synchronization of multiple prescriptions for recipients of medical assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | Assembly | approval memo.106 |
2022-12-30 | Assembly | signed chap.838 |
2022-12-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.513 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S431A |
2022-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.97 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.97 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-01-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00431 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A187