NY A00202 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.257
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.257
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the board of elections to provide special ballots to board of election employees anytime up to the close of polls on election day.
Title
Authorizes the board of elections to provide special ballots to board of election employees anytime up to the close of polls on election day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.257 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.713 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5199 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.12 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S05199 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.257