NY A00204 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-21 - print number 204a
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

This bill requires notice to a locality and allows a municipality or community board to express an opinion for or against the granting or renewal of a license to sell liquor at retail for consumption off the premises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows a municipality or community board to express an opinion before a license is granted to a person to sell liquor at retail for off-premises consumption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-21 print number 204a
2010-04-21 amend and recommit to economic development
2010-01-20 committed to economic development
2010-01-06 ordered to third reading cal.6
2010-01-06 RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-01-06 DIED IN SENATE
2009-03-24 REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
2009-03-24 delivered to senate
2009-03-24 passed assembly
2009-02-26 advanced to third reading cal.123
2009-02-25 reported
2009-02-24 reported referred to codes
2009-01-07 referred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S2375 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback