NY A00204 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-14 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the voter friendly ballot act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the voter friendly ballot act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-14SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2014-01-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-01-14Assemblypassed assembly
2014-01-08Assemblyordered to third reading cal.15
2014-01-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-01-08SenateDIED IN SENATE
2013-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2013-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2013-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2013-06-17Assemblyamended on third reading 204a
2013-02-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.39
2013-02-12Assemblyreported
2013-01-09Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S05350 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback