NY A00208 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.207
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for pre-employment and random drug and alcohol testing of bus drivers; further provides that no person shall consume a drug, controlled substance or an intoxicating liquor, regardless of its alcoholic content, or be under the influence of an intoxicating liquor or drug, within eight hours before going on duty or operating, or having physical control of a bus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for pre-employment and random drug and alcohol testing of bus drivers; further provides that no person shall consume a drug, controlled substance or an intoxicating liquor, regardless of its alcoholic content, or be under the influence of an intoxicating liquor or drug, within eight hours before going on duty or operating, or having physical control of a bus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.207
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.785
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2587E
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.269
2018-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.269
2018-06-18Assemblyreported
2018-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-13Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-06-01Assemblyprint number 208e
2018-06-01Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to transportation
2018-05-21Assemblyprint number 208d
2018-05-21Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2018-03-08Assemblyprint number 208c
2018-03-08Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to transportation
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to transportation
2017-06-15Assemblyprint number 208b
2017-06-15Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to transportation
2017-05-15Assemblyprint number 208a
2017-05-15Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to transportation
2017-01-04Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S02587 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A208E

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00208&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00208&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00208
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00208&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00208A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00208&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00208B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00208&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00208C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00208&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00208D
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00208&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00208E
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00208&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00208&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00208&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00208&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00208&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A208#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback