NY A00212 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on December 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-10 - approval memo.36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on December 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-10 - approval memo.36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to central venous lines; requires hospitals upon discharge of a patient who has a condition that requires a central venous line after discharge, to consult with the designated caregiver to determine his or her capabilities and limitations.
Title
Relates to central venous lines; requires hospitals upon discharge of a patient who has a condition that requires a central venous line after discharge, to consult with the designated caregiver to determine his or her capabilities and limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-10 | Senate | approval memo.36 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | signed chap.617 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.453 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S474 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.3 |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00474 (Same As) 2019-12-10 - approval memo.36