NY A00216 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - substituted by s3846
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - substituted by s3846
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the moratorium on the issuance of certificates of environmental safety for the siting of facilities and certification of routes for the transportation of liquefied natural or petroleum gas.
Title
Extends the moratorium on the issuance of certificates of environmental safety for the siting of facilities and certification of routes for the transportation of liquefied natural or petroleum gas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | Assembly | substituted by s3846 |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.121 |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S03846 (Same As) 2013-05-07 - SIGNED CHAP.27