NY A00216 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the care of animals; requires regular diurnal light cycles of either natural or artificial light; requires separate space for pregnant or nursing dogs; requires a certain level of sanitation of primary enclosures and cages; requires sanitary food receptacles; requires grooming.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the care of animals; requires regular diurnal light cycles of either natural or artificial light; requires separate space for pregnant or nursing dogs; requires a certain level of sanitation of primary enclosures and cages; requires sanitary food receptacles; requires grooming.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-04Senate3RD READING CAL.553
2019-06-04SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3828
2019-03-11SenateREFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE
2019-03-11Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-11Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-07Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.92
2019-03-05Assemblyreported
2019-02-27Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S03828 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A216

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00216&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00216&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00216
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00216&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00216&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00216&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A216#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback