NY A00219 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the board of elections will mail special ballots to victims of domestic violence with sufficient time to cast such ballot prior to the close of polls.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that the board of elections will mail special ballots to victims of domestic violence with sufficient time to cast such ballot prior to the close of polls.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-14Senate3RD READING CAL.615
2019-05-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3232A
2019-05-14SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2019-05-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-14Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-13Assemblyamended on third reading 219a
2019-02-28Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.67
2019-02-27Assemblyreported
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S03232 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A219A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00219&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00219&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00219
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00219&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00219A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00219&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A219#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00219&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback