NY A00222 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring a two-thirds vote of the board in certain circumstances.
Title
Relates to requiring a two-thirds vote of the board in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] |
Asm. David Buchwald [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.8 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.93 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S01897 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S07361 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
S07361 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS