NY A00225 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the registration and regulation of pet groomers; establishes standards of care, training and testing; provides such applicant must be at least eighteen years of age.
Title
Provides for the registration and regulation of pet groomers; establishes standards of care, training and testing; provides such applicant must be at least eighteen years of age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.9 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | amended on third reading 225a |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.316 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S00408 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION