NY A00230 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - signed chap.358
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits emergency service providers from selling patient health information without written consent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits emergency service providers from selling patient health information without written consent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-07Senatesigned chap.358
2019-10-01Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-12Senate3RD READING CAL.1306
2019-06-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4119
2019-05-29SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2019-05-29Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-29Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.369
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-01-15Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S04119 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A230

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00230&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00230&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00230
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00230&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00230&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00230&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A230#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback