NY A00239 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the right to hunt, trap and fish; provides for regulation by the state.
Title
Relates to the right to hunt, trap and fish; provides for regulation by the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2021-01-15 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S03616 (Same As) 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY