NY A00249 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-8)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.209
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes identification cards for individuals with developmental disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes identification cards for individuals with developmental disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.209
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1336
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2565C
2018-01-09SenateREFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
2018-01-09Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-01-09Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.16
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-06SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2017-06-06Senatereturned to senate
2017-06-06Assemblyrepassed assembly
2017-05-24Assemblyamended on third reading (t) 249c
2017-05-24Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2017-05-24AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-05-24Senaterecalled from senate
2017-05-15SenateRECOMMITTED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
2017-05-15Senatereturned to senate
2017-05-15Assemblyrepassed assembly
2017-05-08Assemblyamended on third reading 249b
2017-05-03Assemblyamended on third reading 249a
2017-05-03Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2017-05-03AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-05-03Senaterecalled from senate
2017-05-01SenateREFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
2017-05-01Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-05-01Assemblypassed assembly
2017-04-27Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.171
2017-04-25Assemblyreported
2017-03-28Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-01-11Assemblyreference changed to mental health
2017-01-05Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S02565 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A249C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00249&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00249&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00249
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00249&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00249A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00249&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00249B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00249&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00249C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00249&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00249&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00249&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A249#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback