NY A00249 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that article VII bills submitted by the governor must relate specifically to either an appropriation or a proposal to raise revenue, and be necessary in order to effectuate such appropriation or revenue proposal.
Title
Requires that article VII bills submitted by the governor must relate specifically to either an appropriation or a proposal to raise revenue, and be necessary in order to effectuate such appropriation or revenue proposal.
Sponsors
Asm. Edward Braunstein [D] | Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Asm. Robin Schimminger [D] | Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S01559 (Same As) 2020-08-11 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN