NY A00263 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes certain independent contractors in the state directory of new hires to aid in the administration of the child support enforcement program.
Title
Includes certain independent contractors in the state directory of new hires to aid in the administration of the child support enforcement program.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Cahill [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] |
Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.10 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.214 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07054 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE