NY A00264 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on October 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-17 - signed chap.375
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes patient protections from excessive hospital emergency charges; includes hospital charges, including hospital charges for inpatient services which follow an emergency room visit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes patient protections from excessive hospital emergency charges; includes hospital charges, including hospital charges for inpatient services which follow an emergency room visit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-17Senatesigned chap.375
2019-10-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.1598
2019-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3171A
2019-06-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-05Assemblyruling of chair on point of order
2019-06-05Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.65
2019-06-05Assemblyrules report cal.65
2019-06-05Assemblyreported
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-17Assemblyprint number 264b
2019-05-17Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to insurance
2019-05-02Assemblyprint number 264a
2019-05-02Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to insurance
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S03171 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A264B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00264&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00264&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00264
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00264&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00264A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00264&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00264B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00264&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00264&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00264&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00264&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A264#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback