NY A00271 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that no person shall be discriminated in his or her civil rights because of sex.
Title
Provides that no person shall be discriminated in his or her civil rights because of sex.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Judiciary (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Judiciary (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Senate | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.11 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.45 |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03249 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY