NY A00272 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to equality of rights and protection against discrimination.
Title
Relates to equality of rights and protection against discrimination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | print number 272b |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | print number 272a |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00517 (Same As) 2020-07-08 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION