NY A00310 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-12)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - print number 310b
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes all municipalities, with the consent of the county and the governing body of such municipality, to join a county self-funded or self-insured health plan; requires certification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes all municipalities, with the consent of the county and the governing body of such municipality, to join a county self-funded or self-insured health plan; requires certification.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21Assemblyprint number 310b
2019-05-21Assemblyamend and recommit to insurance
2019-04-22Assemblyprint number 310a
2019-04-22Assemblyamend and recommit to insurance
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S01408 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback