NY A00316 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - approval memo.7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - approval memo.7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the management of the Roosevelt Island operating corporation.
Title
Relates to the management of the Roosevelt Island operating corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | approval memo.7 |
2019-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.383 |
2019-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.774 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1426 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.46 |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S01426 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - approval memo.7