NY A00318 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to informing maternity patients about the risks associated with cesarean section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to informing maternity patients about the risks associated with cesarean section.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED
2019-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.137
2019-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2888A
2019-06-04SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-04Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-04Assemblyrepassed assembly
2019-05-07Assemblyamended on third reading 318a
2019-05-07Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2019-05-07AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-07Senaterecalled from senate
2019-01-23SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2019-01-23Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-01-23Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-17Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.5
2019-01-15Assemblyreported
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S02888 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A318A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback