NY A00339 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of a self-sufficiency standard study regarding how much income is needed for a family of a given composition in a given geographic location to adequately meet its basic needs without public or private assistance.
Title
Relates to the creation of a self-sufficiency standard study regarding how much income is needed for a family of a given composition in a given geographic location to adequately meet its basic needs without public or private assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | print number 339a |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to social services |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S05552 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE