NY A00349 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-16 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-16 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the failure to report a release of hazardous substances is a class A misdemeanor and any such subsequent violation shall be a class E felony.
Title
Provides that the failure to report a release of hazardous substances is a class A misdemeanor and any such subsequent violation shall be a class E felony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-27 | print number 349a | |
2010-05-27 | amend and recommit to codes | |
2010-03-02 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-01-06 | referred to environmental conservation | |
2009-06-17 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-03-17 | reported referred to codes | |
2009-01-07 | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S1100 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION