NY A00349 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of health to adopt policies to exclude certain non-recurring items from income that would artificially inflate the availability of funds to meet current needs relating to eligibility for the program for elderly pharmaceutical insurance coverage.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of health to adopt policies to exclude certain non-recurring items from income that would artificially inflate the availability of funds to meet current needs relating to eligibility for the program for elderly pharmaceutical insurance coverage.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] | Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Alec Brook-Krasny [D] |
Asm. Annette Robinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S00345 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO AGING