NY A00349 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - SIGNED CHAP.439
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - SIGNED CHAP.439
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the filing of petitions of designation or nomination in the county of Westchester.
Title
Relates to the filing of petitions of designation or nomination in the county of Westchester.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. David Buchwald [D] |
Asm. Gary Pretlow [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.439 |
2019-10-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-29 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-29 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.370 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | substituted for a349a |
2019-04-29 | Senate | referred to election law |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.373 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | substituted by s4264 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.370 |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | print number 349a |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S04264 (Same As) 2019-10-30 - SIGNED CHAP.439