NY A00362 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the department of state to study, evaluate and make recommendations concerning safety standards at baseball stadiums to determine whether the protective netting currently in use at baseball stadiums is sufficient to protect spectators during baseball games.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the department of state to study, evaluate and make recommendations concerning safety standards at baseball stadiums to determine whether the protective netting currently in use at baseball stadiums is sufficient to protect spectators during baseball games.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.314
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.314
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-03Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S03823 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00362&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00362&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00362
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00362&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00362&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00362&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00362&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback