NY A00386 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - signed chap.718
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - signed chap.718
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to irregularities in a cover sheet accompanying an application for administrative review or full board review or a rebuttal to such applications, and provides for the correction of such irregularities.
Title
Relates to irregularities in a cover sheet accompanying an application for administrative review or full board review or a rebuttal to such applications, and provides for the correction of such irregularities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.718 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1367 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S829 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.339 |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S00829 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A386