NY A00395 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-16 - advanced to third reading cal.328
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-16 - advanced to third reading cal.328
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to personal and commercial lines insurance; provides that an insurer or producer shall, prior to the time a policy of personal lines insurance is sold or purchased, provide the potential insured with a copy of the policy and allow the potential insured sufficient time to review such policy; further provides that an insurer or producer shall, prior to the time a policy of commercial lines insurance that provides coverage for loss or damage to real property, personal property, or other liabilities for loss or damage to property is sold or purchased, provide the potential insured with a copy of the policy and allow the potential insured sufficient time to review such policy.
Title
Relates to personal and commercial lines insurance; provides that an insurer or producer shall, prior to the time a policy of personal lines insurance is sold or purchased, provide the potential insured with a copy of the policy and allow the potential insured sufficient time to review such policy; further provides that an insurer or producer shall, prior to the time a policy of commercial lines insurance that provides coverage for loss or damage to real property, personal property, or other liabilities for loss or damage to property is sold or purchased, provide the potential insured with a copy of the policy and allow the potential insured sufficient time to review such policy.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Cahill [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. David Buchwald [D] |
Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Nicole Malliotakis [R] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.328 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S03498 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE