NY A00397 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - signed chap.201
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits smoking at all times in facilities that provide child care services in a private home provided that such private home is required to be licensed or registered for child care services, regardless of whether or not children receiving such services are present.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits smoking at all times in facilities that provide child care services in a private home provided that such private home is required to be licensed or registered for child care services, regardless of whether or not children receiving such services are present.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20Senatesigned chap.201
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1498
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7522A
2018-06-04SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.972
2018-05-31Assemblyreported
2018-05-22Assemblyprint number 397b
2018-05-22Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2018-01-23Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-01-17Assemblyprint number 397a
2018-01-17Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to health
2017-01-09Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S07522 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A397B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00397&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00397&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00397
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00397&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00397A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00397&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00397B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00397&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00397&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00397&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A397#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback