NY A00412 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the period of licensure or certification for child care providers shall be for four years; relates to required inspections and background clearances; directs the office of children and family services to promulgate necessary rules and regulations setting forth training requirements.
Title
Provides that the period of licensure or certification for child care providers shall be for four years; relates to required inspections and background clearances; directs the office of children and family services to promulgate necessary rules and regulations setting forth training requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | committed to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.18 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.35 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.35 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-01 | Assembly | print number 412b |
2019-03-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | print number 412a |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to children and families |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S04326 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES