NY A00413 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the rights to contract for the burial of cremains in pet cemeteries; requires notice relating thereto.
Title
Relates to the rights to contract for the burial of cremains in pet cemeteries; requires notice relating thereto.
Sponsors
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] | Asm. Steve Katz [R] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2015-02-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.23 |
2015-02-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |