NY A00413 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - substituted by s3420a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that parents and caretakers who are otherwise eligible for child care assistance, and provided with such assistance, shall be able to utilize such assistance when care is necessary to enable them to sleep because they work non-traditional hours and have a child who is under the age of six and not in school for a full school day; further provides that the authorization for assistance shall be sufficient to allow the parent to obtain up to eight hours of sleep, as needed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that parents and caretakers who are otherwise eligible for child care assistance, and provided with such assistance, shall be able to utilize such assistance when care is necessary to enable them to sleep because they work non-traditional hours and have a child who is under the age of six and not in school for a full school day; further provides that the authorization for assistance shall be sufficient to allow the parent to obtain up to eight hours of sleep, as needed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted by s3420a
2019-06-03Assemblyamended on third reading (t) 413a
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.469
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to children and families

Same As/Similar To

S03420 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback