NY A00416 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.123
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.123
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Syracuse to add unpaid housing code violation penalties, costs and fines to the city's annual tax levy.
Title
Authorizes the city of Syracuse to add unpaid housing code violation penalties, costs and fines to the city's annual tax levy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.123 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2099 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.467 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.467 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-16 | Assembly | print number 416a |
2018-06-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S03131 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES