NY A00420 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - amended on third reading 420b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requiring a medical facility or related service to obtain express prior written consent before filming and/or broadcasting of visual images of a patient's medical treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requiring a medical facility or related service to obtain express prior written consent before filming and/or broadcasting of visual images of a patient's medical treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11Assemblyamended on third reading 420b
2019-06-03Assemblyamended on third reading 420a
2019-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.215
2019-04-30Assemblyreported
2019-01-15Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S01693 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00420&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00420&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00420
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00420&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00420A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00420&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00420B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00420&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00420&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback