NY A00426 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that any plan of apportionment relating to the division of a county, except a county wholly contained within a city, into districts for the purpose of apportionment or reapportionment of members of its local legislative body shall be subject to federal and state constitutional requirements; further provides for standards to be followed for such plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that any plan of apportionment relating to the division of a county, except a county wholly contained within a city, into districts for the purpose of apportionment or reapportionment of members of its local legislative body shall be subject to federal and state constitutional requirements; further provides for standards to be followed for such plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-17Assemblyprint number 426a
2019-06-17Assemblyamend and recommit to local governments
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S04611 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback