NY A00433 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - signed chap.445
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - signed chap.445
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the regulation of key persons in addition to directors and officers of certain corporations.
Title
Provides for the regulation of key persons in addition to directors and officers of certain corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Senate | signed chap.445 |
2019-10-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-04-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.287 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2267 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.95 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S02267 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - signed chap.445