NY A00434 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain corporations to permit shareholders to attend meetings via remote communication and to be deemed present for voting purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain corporations to permit shareholders to attend meetings via remote communication and to be deemed present for voting purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-13Senate3RD READING CAL.557
2019-05-13SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4088
2019-03-11SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2019-03-11Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-11Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-07Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.96
2019-03-05Assemblyreported
2019-02-12Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S04088 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A434

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00434&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00434&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00434
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00434&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00434&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00434&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A434#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback