NY A00453 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to liability of members for wages due to laborers, servants or employees by domestic and foreign limited liability companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to liability of members for wages due to laborers, servants or employees by domestic and foreign limited liability companies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-01Senate3RD READING CAL.367
2019-05-01SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2734
2019-03-11SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2019-03-11Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-11Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-07Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.97
2019-03-05Assemblyreported
2019-02-12Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S02734 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A453

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00453&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00453&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00453
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00453&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00453&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00453&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A453#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback