NY A00456 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.558
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.558
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of directors of certain cooperative corporations and not-for-profit corporations to provide tenants with changes to the by-laws in writing within ten days of adoption; requires notification to tenants of changes affecting occupancy or the rules of the building.
Title
Requires the board of directors of certain cooperative corporations and not-for-profit corporations to provide tenants with changes to the by-laws in writing within ten days of adoption; requires notification to tenants of changes affecting occupancy or the rules of the building.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.558 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-13 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.163 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | substituted for a456a |
2019-06-11 | Senate | referred to housing |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4956A |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1144 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | substituted by s4956a |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 456a |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.163 |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S04956 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.558