NY A00458 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the transfer of a portion of fines issued for illegally passing a school bus to the comprehensive school bus driver safety training program for the study and promotion of issues involving school bus safety; establishes a school bus motorist education fund.
Title
Provides for the transfer of a portion of fines issued for illegally passing a school bus to the comprehensive school bus driver safety training program for the study and promotion of issues involving school bus safety; establishes a school bus motorist education fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.36 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.200 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.200 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S01239 (Same As) 2016-05-24 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE