NY A00458 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates certain medical providers employed by a municipal police department, while deployed with the special weapons and tactics team, as peace officers.
Title
Designates certain medical providers employed by a municipal police department, while deployed with the special weapons and tactics team, as peace officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | print number 458a |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01851 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - PRINT NUMBER 1851A